Governing document NEOTROPICAL BIRD CLUB
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/1994 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2014 as amended on 08 Jun 2020 as amended on 19 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF, AND AN INTEREST IN, NEOTROPICAL BIRDS, AND THE CONSERVATION OF NEOTROPICAL BIRDS. 4.2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CLUB MAY:- (A) ACT AS A FORUM FOR PERSONS INTERESTED IN NEOTROPICAL BIRDS BY HOLDING MEETINGS, AND PUBLISHING MATERIALS CONCERNING NEOTROPICAL BIRDS, (B) WORK WITH INDIVIDUALS AND NON-PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATIONS PURSUING AIMS OR ACTIVITIES CONCERNED WITH NEOTROPICAL BIRDS, (C) ENCOURAGE MEMBERS TO CONTRIBUTE TO CONSERVATION RESEARCH ON NEOTROPICAL BIRDS.
Area of benefit
NEOTROPICAL REGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.