TROWBRIDGE VISUALLY IMPAIRED CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a weekly social club for blind and visually impaired people in Trowbridge, Wiltshire and district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 August 1994: Standard registration
- TROWBRIDGE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE JUNE KIBBLE HORSELL | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DONALD ERNEST KIBBLE ESCOTT | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BLAKMORE | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAM POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joan Jefferies | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £2.76k | £1.50k | £5.77k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.24k | £83 | £2.29k | £3.73k | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 27/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF BLIND AND/OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-TROWBRIDGE AND WEST WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 46
Regal Court
Bythesea Road
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 8HJ
- Phone:
- 01225774281
- Email:
- joanjefferies@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window