KOREAN RESIDENT SOCIETY IN UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of Poverty, of the aged, and of disabled people (amongst persons of Korean origin resident i nthe U.K.), The advancement of education for the benefit of the public, To promote good race relations between different races by encouraging equality of opportunity between persons of different racial groups, and seeking to eliminate discrimincation on the grounds of race.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOUNG JU SONG | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SEON HEE PARK | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ju Hee Kim | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.78k | £54.33k | £54.59k | £32.99k | £52.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.52k | £53.82k | £48.30k | £30.25k | £58.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 March 2022 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 March 2022 | 499 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
PROVIDE RELIEF TO POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
108-110 COOMBE LANE
RAYNES PARK
LONDON
SW20 0AY
- Phone:
- 07766233300
- Email:
- KRSUK35@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window