INDIAN SENIOR CITIZEN'S CENTRE (MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides culturally sensitive Day Resource Services for the Indian older people of city wide Manchester and surrounding areas. These include basic Day Care i.e. transport, hot Indian meals, entertainment activities, library, shopping, monthly coach trips, preventative health and rehabilitation services, information & advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,532 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
Governance
- 16 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Niranjan Harishanker Bhatt | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Hasmukh Bhagwan Patel | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sureshchandra Patel | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.18k | £43.61k | £68.54k | £72.61k | £64.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.26k | £71.20k | £115.30k | £110.23k | £136.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £44.24k | £13.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.50k | £38.39k | £26.96k | £12.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 1994, 18 MAY 1995, 25 JULY 1996 13 AUGUST 1998, 10TH MAY 2001 24 AUGUST 2006 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR ELDERLY INDIANS, IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE CITY OF MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH WHICH THE CENTRE IS CONTRACTED. (SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
CITY OF MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
16-18 WHALLEY ROAD
MANCHESTER
M16 8AB
- Phone:
- 01612320999
- Email:
- miscc1618@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window