Financial history THE SELNEC EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1040173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £6.35k £33.50k £34.24k £4.09k £4.70k
Total expenditure £34.78k £33.19k £33.35k £58.74k £61.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A