Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF LICHFIELD ST CHAD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1040183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.62k £2.91k £39.49k £40.49k £24.94k
Total expenditure £19.80k £12.58k £20.34k £21.78k £21.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A