PORTSMOUTH ROYAL DOCKYARD HISTORICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO HISTORIC AND THE INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE ROYAL DOCKYARD AT PORTMSOUTH. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE HISTORY OF THE DOCKYARD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 17 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Alec Miles | Chair | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frank Jonas | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Kate Prowse | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Willcocks | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barry David Woolley | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whiteley Huitson | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Bassett | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Wood | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Captain William Oliphant | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Linger | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN FRENCH | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|||||
SARAH ELIZABETH PATERSON | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID STEPHEN BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.75k | £1.58k | £1.77k | £3.28k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £2.76k | £2.43k | £1.68k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY AND THE INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE ROYAL DOCKYARD AT PORTSMOUTH("THE DOCKYARD") AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE HISTORY OF THE DOCKYARD; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE DOCKYARD BY THE ESTABLISHMENTOF A PUBLIC MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 COLLEGE ROAD
H M NAVAL BASE
PORTSMOUTH
HAMPSHIRE
PO1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 02392820921
- Email:
- chiefexecpa@pnbpt.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window