BURTON UPON TRENT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The bureau provides free, confidential, impartial and independent advice to anyone living, working or caring for somebody living in the Borough of East Staffordshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 August 1994: Standard registration
- 01 December 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 01 December 2008: Funds transferred to 1115630 EAST STAFFORDSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- EAST STAFFORDSHIRE CAB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.67k | £179.39k | £226.09k | £345.34k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.82k | £168.37k | £172.79k | £294.02k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 11 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 27 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 27 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 10 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 13 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BURTON UOPN TRENT AND ITS ENVIRONS
Area of benefit
BURTON UPON TRENT AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window