Financial history ST MARY'S BAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1040249
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £72.39k £67.22k £63.51k £63.99k £67.25k
Total expenditure £26.11k £72.77k £33.67k £29.00k £31.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.99k £38.20k £4.00k N/A