ST MARY'S BAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 18 August 1994: Standard registration
- ST. MARY'S BAY NEW VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Cooper | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FORSTER | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER MESSER | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DIFFEY | Trustee | 07 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANICE BIFFIN | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ALLISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.39k | £67.22k | £63.51k | £63.99k | £67.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.11k | £72.77k | £33.67k | £29.00k | £31.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.99k | £38.20k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 May 2024 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 May 2024 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 December 2023 | 490 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 December 2023 | 490 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2019
(These accounts |
01 August 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST. MARY IN THE MARSH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ST MARY'S BAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Jefferstone Lane
St. Marys Bay
Romney Marsh
TN29 0SQ
- Phone:
- 01303873215
- Email:
- stmbvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
St.Mary'sBay.net/VillageHall
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window