Imani

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates in the UK, Uganda, Nepal, India & Ethiopia. In the UK and India the Charity undertakes school visits reaffirming a positive life message through Christian teachings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Ethiopia
- India
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 August 1994: Standard registration
- AN OPEN DOOR (Working name)
- AN OPEN DOOR INTO YOUR HEART (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH KILLA | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
CARL BRETTLE | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.18k | £45.36k | £20.68k | £14.31k | £10.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.66k | £45.86k | £19.93k | £14.17k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 29 NOVEMBER 1996 BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 as amended on 10 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE TEACHING AND PREACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL TO CHILDREN IN SOUTH WALES OR ELSEWHERE, INCLUDING OVERSEAS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE, WITH NO CHARGE TO BE MADE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WALES OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28A PARK STREET
TONNA
NEATH
SA11 3JF
- Phone:
- 08707601323
- Email:
- admin@anopendoor.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window