Financial history CREATIVE ARTS EAST

Charity number: 1040321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £550.49k £429.19k £481.92k £597.47k £644.70k
Total expenditure £549.38k £429.76k £485.76k £599.93k £643.29k
Income from government contracts £23 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £172.21k £29.81k £17.31k £73.59k £32.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £175.97k N/A N/A £191.63k £225.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £373.41k N/A N/A £402.75k £405.23k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.11k N/A N/A £3.09k £14.20k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £549.38k N/A N/A £599.93k £643.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.76k N/A N/A £5.30k £4.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0