NORFOLK PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norfolk Park is a city park and one of the oldest in Sheffield. The Centre in the Park continues to have regular communities activities including creche, youth clubs, elderly person's lunch clubs, health walks, running club as well as routine meetings and bookings throughout the day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £199,016 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 August 1994: Standard registration
- NORFOLK HERITAGE PARK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.39k | £185.57k | £242.96k | £312.12k | £322.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.13k | £233.96k | £308.59k | £329.86k | £364.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £132.70k | £147.24k | £167.21k | £236.01k | £199.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 April 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 April 2022 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
(1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND. (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND. (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL
TOWN HALL
PINSTONE STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 2HH
- Phone:
- 07867150747
- Email:
- ruth.bell@sheffield.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window