Trustees CITY OF PLYMOUTH FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1040360

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simara Winter | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Curtain | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cook | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
zoe marie vigus | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL STRAW | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.