Financial history FRIENDS OF DITCHEAT SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1040376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.83k £8.83k £17.70k £6.85k £8.09k
Total expenditure £8.90k £6.12k £3.18k £19.91k £5.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A