WEST RHYL YOUNG PEOPLES PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rhyl based charity for young people aged 11 to 25, providing: Young people's drop-in & youth centre, outreach and street-based detached youth work, counselling & clinic facilities, Youth Support Coordination, Pixel - alternative education programme, and Viva - lesbian, gay, bisexual & trans youth support (across North Wales), including diversity and equalities training and consultancy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £66,913 from 1 government contract(s) and £235,852 from 6 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 25 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KRISTINA KORDIAK | Chair | 13 February 2012 |
|
|||
Craig Phillip Semple | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||
Caroline Brady | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.56k | £269.70k | £299.14k | £379.58k | £388.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.50k | £244.27k | £284.65k | £308.90k | £372.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £79.08k | £32.04k | £69.80k | £66.91k | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.74k | £67.49k | £207.44k | £220.47k | £235.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2022 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2022 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 1993, AS AMENDED 12 AUGUST 1994, AS AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING AND ADVICE SERVICE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST RHYL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST RHYL YOUNG PEOPLES CENTRE
17 BEDFORD STREET
RHYL
LL18 1SY
- Phone:
- 01745351293
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window