BORDER PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1040403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity consists of a preschool for children under the age of 5, after school childcare for children age 11 and under and holiday childcare for the same age group.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £91,717
Total expenditure: £94,999

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BORDER PLAYGROUP LLANYMYNECH (Previous name)
  • BORDER PRESCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICTORIA MORRIS Chair 18 March 2015
None on record
LISA EVANS Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
CHERYL HAYWARD Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
KATIE FARMER Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
SIAN NORTH Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Sam Farr Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record
Rebecca James Trustee 16 June 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £102.59k £87.22k £87.61k £90.36k £91.72k
Total expenditure £86.45k £77.57k £83.22k £91.51k £95.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £148 N/A £360 £459 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 July 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 July 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VILLAGE HALL
STATION ROAD
LLANYMYNECH
SY22 6EE
Phone:
01691830565
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available