THE CHRISTIAN DANCE FELLOWSHIP OF BRITAIN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 25 August 1994: Standard registration
- 08 March 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 March 2007: Funds transferred to 1115037 THE CHRISTIAN DANCE FELLOWSHIP OF BRITAIN
- C D F B (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.04k | £20.81k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £15.20k | £11.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 21 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 21 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 20 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 20 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 22 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 22 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED ON 2 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MINISTRY AND ART OF DANCE, TO GLORIFY GOD AND EXALT JESUS, SERVING THE BODY OF CHRIST AND PREPARING THE CHURCH OF CHRIST FOR HIS RETURN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window