Accounts and annual returns THE PORTSMOUTH COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1040457
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 18 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 March 2010 510 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 07 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 07 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 07 June 2006 On Time