COLNE VALLEY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
Governance
- 26 August 1994: Standard registration
- 29 June 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 20 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF COLNE VALLEY HUDDERSFIELD WEST YORKSHIRE (INCLUDING SLAITHWAITE MARSDEN AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA) AND IN PARTICULAR (1) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF ANY BUILDINGS OF AESTHETIC, HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST OR IMPORTANCE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
COLNE VALLEY HUDDERSFIELD (INCLUDING SLAITHWAITE MARSDEN AND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window