Trustees HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1040505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Celine Kicks Chair 02 November 2017
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Amanda Foster Trustee 07 November 2024
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Karen Clarke Trustee 09 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Jane Gerdes Trustee 09 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Jennifer Kennedy Trustee 07 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
David Incoll Trustee 01 November 2023
HARDEN PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered