HOPE AND HOMES FOR CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Governance
- 31 August 1994: Standard registration
- 28 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HHC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 12 December 2007 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 February 2006 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 AUGUST 1994 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 27 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD REGARDLESS OF RACE COLOUR CREED OR BACKGROUND WHO ARE IN NEED OF A HOME BY AND ORPHANAGES AND THE RENOVATION RE-EQUIPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF EXISTING HOMES AND ORPHANAGES FOR SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window