Trustees FRIENDS OF THE DEAN GARNIER GARDEN
Charity Number: 1040551

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Russell | Chair | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Last | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Anne Wood | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Last | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Amy Wheeler | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fran Carroll | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PAUL NIEBUHR TOD | Trustee | 09 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Janet Averil Hurrell | Trustee | 11 October 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.