Financial history BIRMINGHAM JAZZ

Charity number: 1040567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.59k £4.14k £42.45k £41.09k £40.32k
Total expenditure £60.01k £4.40k £42.08k £42.34k £43.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A