Accounts and annual returns BEDS AND NORTH HERTS IA

Charity number: 1040573
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 05 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 31 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 31 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 21 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required