CROSSROADS CARE STAFFORDSHIRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crossroads Care Staffordshire Limited's main aim is to support Carers in their caring role.-This is achieved through the provision of a respite service, usually within the carer's own home, provided by trained Care Support Workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £182,681 from 3 government contract(s) and £2,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 September 1994: Standard registration
- CROSSROADS CARE STAFFORDSHIRE (Working name)
- CROSSROADS (STAFFORDSHIRE) CARING FOR CARERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE STAFFORDSHIRE CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANTS SCHEMES LTD (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARY BROOKES | Chair | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joy Whiting | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN ERICA SMITH | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Tams | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Diane Mary Hall | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN FLEVILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN DOUGLAS MACGREGOR MILNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08m | £1.05m | £948.06k | £885.03k | £428.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.02m | £943.02k | £896.73k | £434.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £371.96k | £747.95k | £276.35k | £428.74k | £182.68k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £149.60k | £38.67k | N/A | £2.25k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.80k | £1.23k | £6.75k | £2.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £949.89k | £835.34k | £896.69k | £880.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £126.74k | £211.17k | £44.61k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.02m | £942.39k | £896.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £232 | £1.52k | £631 | £186 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.16k | £20.51k | £21.58k | £17.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/03/2010 as amended on 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The Company's Objects are specifically restricted to the following:- (a) the relief of those in need by reason of age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage through the provision of comprehensive support services for carers throughout the County of Staffordshire; and (b) The assistance of carers in need including by raising awareness of issues affecting carers.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Environment House
Werrington Road
Bucknall
Stoke on Trent
Staffordshire
ST2 9AF
- Phone:
- 01782 268391
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window