CARIBBEAN ISLAMIC CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1040585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

7 Executive meetings. A calendar and a Ramadan Chart. 2 fundraising lunches Religious events:-Eid-ul-Adha, Asurah, Isra-wal-Miraj, Shab Qadar, Ramadhan and Laiatul Qadar, Iftars and Taraweeh prayers. 6 Dawah Donation given out: £3,240

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,787
Total expenditure: £5,484

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brent
  • City Of London
  • Hounslow
  • Merton
  • Wandsworth
  • Guyana

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMAD RASHIED Chair
None on record
Bibi Alimoon Yusuf Trustee 18 April 2013
None on record
Bibi Alimoon Khan Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
BIBI FARIDA KHAN Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
MRS AMIROOL ANIFF Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
SHIREEN KAMALL Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
Shamshoon Nesha Zamal Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.28k £4.29k £23.76k £22.04k £6.79k
Total expenditure £3.94k £2.50k £16.11k £13.28k £5.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 February 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 May 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 February 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 South Gardens
Colliers Wood
LONDON
SW19 2NT
Phone:
02085406043
Website:

No information available