Financial history ENDEAVOUR HIGH SCHOOL PRIZES FUND

Charity number: 1040618
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £538 £537 £526 £526 £527
Total expenditure £882 £0 £0 £1.29k £973
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A