ST JAMES' HOUSE SURGERY COMMUNITY NURSES EQUIPMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing equipment needed to care for patients at home
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 September 1994: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £2.35k | £1.17k | £3.70k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | £3.16k | £0 | £1.71k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 14 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE ASSETS OR INCOME IN WHOLE OR IN PART FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICINE, THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR THE PURCHASE AND MAINTENANCE OF MEDICAL NURSING EQUIPMENT AND MACHINERY FOR THE ST JAMES HOUSE SURGERY DISTRICT NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE-THE BOROUGH OF KINGS LYNN AND WEST N
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window