NMA MONEY ADVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 September 1994: Standard registration
- 04 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £491.24k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £492.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 05 October 2006 | 127 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF MONEY ADVICE TO PERSONS IN NEED AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DEBT MANAGEMENT IN EAST ANGLIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE-EAST ANGLIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window