Ferring Retirement Club

Charity Number: 1040624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE RUN FOR THE ELDERLY OF THE VILLAGE A COFFEE MORNING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES SUCH AS TABLE TENNIS,BOWLS,BRIDGE,KNIT & NATTER POETRY,CHOIR,DANCE FIT,SEATED EXERCISES,RUMMIKUB.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £43,833
Total expenditure: £63,871

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB INC FRIENDS OF FERRING (Previous name)
  • FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB-INCORPORATING FRIENDS OF FERRING (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Noelle Pratt Chair 12 September 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Jan Garland Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Heather Hones Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Ann Lambert Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Betty McCann Trustee 11 July 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Jeannette O'Sullivan Trustee 11 July 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Bernadette Griffin Trustee 10 May 2022
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Roger Charles Williams Abbott Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Lynda Susan Gould Trustee 25 November 2020
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £177.85k £11.22k £27.91k £42.31k £43.83k
Total expenditure £21.47k £11.94k £27.11k £34.55k £63.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 29 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
GREYSTOKE ROAD
FERRING
WORTHING
BN12 5JL
Phone:
07522092690