Trustees Ferring Retirement Club

Charity number: 1040624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Noelle Pratt Chair 12 September 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Jan Garland Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Heather Hones Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Ann Lambert Trustee 20 November 2024
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Betty McCann Trustee 11 July 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Jeannette O'Sullivan Trustee 11 July 2023
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Bernadette Griffin Trustee 10 May 2022
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered
Roger Charles Williams Abbott Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Lynda Susan Gould Trustee 25 November 2020
FERRING RETIREMENT CLUB
Recently registered