Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE'S FIELD (TOLWORTH) FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1040635
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 February 2006 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 15 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 15 November 2004 On Time