Accounts and annual returns CORNERSTONE CHURCH SWANSEA TRUST

Charity number: 1040639
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2010 09 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2009 13 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 13 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2007 09 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 09 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2006 23 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 23 November 2006 On Time