Financial history SWINTON PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1040640
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.45k £54.30k £50.84k £55.53k £55.74k
Total expenditure £48.80k £50.93k £62.82k £62.76k £61.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £48.23k £38.13k £41.20k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £984 N/A £43.76k