SWINTON PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1040640
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RUNS A PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP FOR TEN 3 HOUR SESSIONS A WEEK, OVER FIVE DAYS, IN A COMMUNITY BUILDING IN A SMALL VILLAGE IN RURAL NORTH YORKSHIRE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £55,744
Total expenditure: £61,829

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charli Byng Chair 20 April 2018
None on record
Caroline Sarah Braithwaite Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Steven Revis Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Andrea Campbell-Robson Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Graham Smith Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Beverley Ann Lomax Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Rebecca Stephenson Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Jennifer Smith Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Hayley Revis Trustee 22 November 2016
SWINTON READING ROOM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.45k £54.30k £50.84k £55.53k £55.74k
Total expenditure £48.80k £50.93k £62.82k £62.76k £61.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £48.23k £38.13k £41.20k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £984 N/A £43.76k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 February 2025 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 February 2025 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 February 2025 385 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SWINTON
PLAYGROUP
MAIN STREET
SWINTON
MALTON
YO17 6SL
Phone:
01653695020
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available