Financial history THE SHEFFIELD RECREATION BAND CLUB

Charity number: 1040661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.14k £22.40k £6.32k £17.34k £17.34k
Total expenditure £17.08k £8.75k £8.62k £19.51k £19.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A