Financial history THE SANDWELL CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME LIMITED

Charity Number: 1040679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.97m £2.39m £2.42m £2.09m £2.10m
Total expenditure £1.91m £2.17m £2.48m £2.40m £1.98m
Income from government contracts £1.13m £1.27m £1.97m £1.19m £1.24m
Income from government grants £158.60k £365.58k £434.78k £274.75k £309.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.78k £9.81k £9.04k £21.02k £12.30k
Income - Other trading activities £2.69k £200 £5.07k £8.49k £1.32k
Income - Charitable activities £1.95m £2.37m £2.40m £2.06m £2.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.74k £4.13k £2.24k £3.03k £4.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.91m £2.17m £2.48m £2.40m £1.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.70k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.46k £0 £3.60k £3.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0