Financial history HOLYWELL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1040692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.54k £315 £3.75k £4.67k £3.64k
Total expenditure £10.18k £65 £5.36k £2.58k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A