FREEDOMS ARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are continuing with our vision to impact our community in everyway with the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ. Our activities include: Regular Sunday and midweek services Bridging the gap between churches Youth group that meets once a week Continuing to reach out to our community in various ways
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Johnson | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valentine Obi | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Mensah | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLUWATOYIN OWOLABI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ONIMIM LOLOBA OBUNGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.98k | £314.36k | £313.56k | £405.36k | £486.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.99k | £245.01k | £252.49k | £492.82k | £485.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 December 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 09 December 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH JULY 1994
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION B)TO RELIEVE NEED HARDSHIP AND PERSONS WHO ARE AGED OR SICK C) GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF BENEFIT TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Freedom's Ark
Tottenham Town Hall
Town Hall Approach
London
N15 4RY
- Phone:
- 02084930050
- Email:
- info@freedomsark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window