Trustees COMMUNITY HOUSING AND THERAPY
Charity number: 1040713

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Watson | Chair | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neelam Khawani-Connett | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Monomita Raksit | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Smalinsky Mahony | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hilary Robbin Coker | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Susan Mizen | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Eeles | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Oram | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Rowe | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.