FRIENDS OF UPPINGHAM CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1040729
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING FOR SCHOOL THROUGH PLANT SALES, RAFFLES, CAKE STALL ETC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Total income: £3,634
Total expenditure: £8,209
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Rutland
Governance
Registration history:
- 10 September 1994: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 July 2012: Re-registered
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 October 2014: Re-registered
- 30 January 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- FOS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32k | £6.02k | £5.89k | £6.09k | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.77k | £1.49k | £6.34k | £2.99k | £8.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window