REDBURY JELLY BABIES PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1040732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We cater for children aged 2 yrs to 5 yrs. We operate in accordance with the EYFS and LEA funding is available up to 30 hours per week for 3-4year olds and 15 hours for eligible 2 year old. We work in partnership with parents/carers. . We operate from Longbridge Methodist Church and are OFsted registered.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £87,133
Total expenditure: £51,775

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JELLY BABIES NURSERY & PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID WALKER Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
BRIAN KITE Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.30k £44.91k £58.60k £80.57k £87.13k
Total expenditure £70.08k £45.57k £46.30k £54.05k £51.78k
Income from government contracts N/A £43.05k N/A N/A £48.26k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LONGBRIDGE METHODIST CHURCH
1654 BRISTOL ROAD SOUTH
BIRMINGHAM
B45 9QB
Phone:
07741002542
Website:

No information available