Trustees St Mary's CVA Marple Bridge PTA
Charity Number: 1040736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shauna Keegan-Bowling | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Clarke | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lara Drake | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Kayes | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harrison | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Kayes | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sabeen Tempowski | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Claire Tognarelli | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Wall | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.