THE MATHIESON MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to provide education in Western and Indian classical music, dance, drama and fine arts in India, Britain and other parts of the world. The Trust raises funds to assist its sister trust, The Mathieson Music School in Kolkata, India. It provides teaching for children who are selected either because they are orphans or from the poorest of the poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 14 September 1994: Standard registration
- MATHIESON MUSIC TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satyajit Theodore Biswas | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geetanjali Sarah Biswas | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE CHRISTINA LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANUP KUMAR BISWAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW HOWARD AUSTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
AGNES BISWAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.76k | £201.53k | £84.25k | £123.48k | £123.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.14k | £166.75k | £114.32k | £176.08k | £102.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE MATHIESON MUSIC SCHOOL, BARISHA, CALCUTTA, INDIA (2) TO FURTHER EDUCATION (IN INDIA UK OR ELSEWHERE) IN MUSIC, DANCE, DRAMA OR ANY OF THE PERFORMING ARTS (3) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC, DANCE , DRAMA OR ANY OF THE PERFORMING ARTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND PERFORMANCES
Area of benefit
INDIA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
93B CAMBRIDGE GARDENS
LONDON
W10 6JE
- Phone:
- 07768720124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window