Trustees OLD WINDSOR PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1040764

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bourne | Chair | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Kate Yates | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth England | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurel Rolfe | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Amin | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susana Ferreira | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Kyley | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Noor Al Ani | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Forster | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Baker | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.