THE FRIENDS OF ST ENDELLION CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in particular but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing by the care, maintenance and preservation of the fabric, fittings, ornaments and furnishings of the Church of St Endellion, North Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN FRANK ROWLAND | Chair | 24 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Craig Laurence Marshall | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna May Patricia Cook | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerstin Lewis | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Hunt | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Endellion Clare Sharpe | Trustee | 29 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Nigel Rapsey | Trustee | 29 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Hardman | Trustee | 27 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGH CRADDOCK | Trustee | 24 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID RONALD EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.53k | £7.38k | £8.19k | £8.66k | £24.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.49k | £14.04k | £9.59k | £885 | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE CARE, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC, FITTINGS, ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS OF THE CHURCH OF ST ENDELLION
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ST ENDELLION
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 SMOKIES WAY
BIDDULPH
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST8 6TZ
- Phone:
- 01782519925
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window