THE MARGAM ABBEY MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote improve and maintain public education and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects by the presentation of Public Concerts and recitals and to make the Abbey Church a venue for performances of music for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 15 September 1994: Standard registration
- MARGAM ABBEY MUSIC FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Evans | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jones | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Adrian Hier | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Jones Mrs. | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ralph David | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY HUSSELL | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GODFREY HUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUW TREGELLES WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN MARK GULLIFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/06/2020 | 23/06/2021 | 23/06/2022 | 23/06/2023 | 23/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £6 | £0 | £0 | £57 | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 June 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. TO MAINTAIN AND REPAIR THE ORGAN OF THE ABBEY CHURCH OF SAINT MARY AT MARGAM PORT TALBOT.
Area of benefit
MARGAM PORT TALBOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cameron Jones Hussell & Howe
1-5 Grove Place
PORT TALBOT
SA13 1HX
- Phone:
- 01639885261
- Email:
- jghussell@cjhh.com
- Website:
-
nowebsite.address
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window