BRIDGEND AND DISTRICT RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Y Bont provides specialist care and support to children with disabilities aged 6 weeks to 12 years. Not only do we support the children, but we support the families, siblings, carers and other supporters of the child with family sessions, events, advice and support should they need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £16,938 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
Governance
- 15 September 1994: Standard registration
- 14 October 2024: Funds received from 518495 ST DONATS NURSERY SCHOOL
- Y BONT (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN RODERICK | Chair |
|
||||||
Christina Davies | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Manley | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Minton | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS SHEILA STEPHEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £457.02k | £379.13k | £441.98k | £401.46k | £297.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.24k | £391.39k | £429.05k | £444.76k | £417.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.33k | £36.33k | £36.33k | £101.65k | £16.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN WITH LEARNING, PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE SAID CHILDREN AND TO SUPPORT THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES
Area of benefit
BRIDGEND TOWN AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y Bont
Ewenny Road
Bridgend
CF31 3HT
- Phone:
- 01656646013
- Email:
- admin@ybont.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window