Governing document Purple Oak Support
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1994 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 12 Nov 2019 as amended on 30 Nov 2021 as amended on 24 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
The company is established primarily for the relief of those persons within the Area of Benefit with learning disabilities, but also for those with physical disabilities and mental health-related needs, including by providing, procuring or facilitating care, services and support. 'Area of Benefit' shall mean Andover and Southern England.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ANDOVER AND ITS NATURAL CATCHMENT AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.